FOURSQUARE CHURCH ANGELUS TEMPLE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Teaching and preaching the gospel of Jesus Christ. Gift and donations to orphanage, support for the older adults, widows, poor and unemployed within our community. mentoring youths and teenagers to become good and God fearing adults, working with them to improve our community. We also send funds to disaster areas and providing support to the homeless and vulnerable people in our local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Southwark
Governance
- 30 March 2000: Standard registration
- FOURSQUARE CHURCH [ANGELUS TEMPLE] (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PASTOR OYEKAN REGINALD | Chair | 10 December 1999 |
|
|
||||
Michael Oputa | Trustee | 03 October 2000 |
|
|
||||
LOLA REGINALD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £41.50k | £46.11k | £39.75k | £42.09k | £50.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.78k | £35.66k | £37.89k | £33.30k | £27.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 191 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 13 August 2024 | 287 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2022
(These accounts |
13 August 2024 | 287 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 20 November 2021 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 15 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST EXECUTED 10 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH OF THE FOURSQUARE GOSPEL CHURCH
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Fountain Green Square
London
SE16 4TX
- Phone:
- 07949462531
- Email:
- angelustemple@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window