THE SOUTH SHIELDS GILBERT AND SULLIVAN OPERATIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE PERFORM AMATEUR PRODUCTIONS AROUND THE SOUTH SHIELDS AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gateshead
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- South Tyneside
- Sunderland
Governance
- 25 July 2000: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 05 July 2010: Standard registration
- SOUTH SHIELDS G AND S SOCIETY (Working name)
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Adrian Jackson | Chair | 17 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JUNE PARKER | Trustee | 31 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE STOTT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.30k | £1.11k | £3.01k | £1.45k | £9.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £10.52k | £1.33k | £2.09k | £3.65k | £11.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 4 MAY 2000
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS , TO FURTHER THE DEVELOPMENT OF PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE SAID ARTS (TO ASSIST AND FURTHER SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AND CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE)
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
99 Sydney Court
GATESHEAD
NE8 2EH
- Phone:
- 07984714932
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window