Trustees CHEDDAR YOUTH TRUST
Charity Number: 1080105
Up to date
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLIVE RICHARD MALCOLM PANCHAUD | Chair | 21 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR WILLIAM JENNINGS | Trustee | 15 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA CARY-BROWN | Trustee | 11 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Meldon | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Richard Alexander William Smith | Trustee | 08 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Corran Fineran | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
PENELOPE MORGAN | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
REV Stuart Sandeman Burns | Trustee | 14 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
SIMON CHILDS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JENNIE COLTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANICE Angela RANCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH HERRING | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.