Financial history VEGA SCIENCE TRUST

Charity Number: 1082718
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2009 31/12/2010 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014
Total gross income £60.18k £52.26k £40.91k £496 £0
Total expenditure £68.89k £74.04k £92.68k £978 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A