VEGA SCIENCE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training The general public/mankind
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 October 2000: Standard registration
- 29 April 2015: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £60.18k | £52.26k | £40.91k | £496 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £68.89k | £74.04k | £92.68k | £978 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 15 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 29 July 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 28 February 2013 | 28 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 04 March 2013 | 32 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM & ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13 AUGUST 1999, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MAY 2000 AND 19 JULY 2002
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN THE FIELD OF SCIENCE BY PRODUCING SCIENCE FILMS FEATURING PROMINENT SCIENTISTS INCLUDING NOBLE PRIZEWINNERS AND TO HOLD ROYAL INSTITUTION DISCOURSES AND TO ARRANGE FOR THE PUBLICATION OF THESE AND OF IMPORTANT ARCHIVAL SCIENTIFIC MATERIAL ON VARIOUS FORMS OF MEDIA INCLUDING TELEVISION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window