HOURGLASS EDUCATIONAL ARTS DEVELOPMENT SERVICES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heads is a community arts organisation, initialising visual and performing arts, digital media and creative writing projects across Calderdale. Heads was formed in 1999, and since then has been working with professional artists providing art workshops for individuals, schools and groups many of whom would not normally participate in creative arts activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2010
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- City Of Wakefield
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
Governance
- 21 September 2000: Standard registration
- 17 May 2011: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEADS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2006 | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.88k | £51.62k | £48.21k | £52.17k | £14.57k | |
|
Total expenditure | £26.68k | £36.46k | £47.42k | £43.48k | £47.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 22 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 22 December 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 10 December 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 14 December 2009 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | 19 December 2008 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | 29 December 2008 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20/12/99
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, INCLUDING CHILDREN, IN THE ARTS OF PAINTING,DRAWING,SCULPTURE,OTHER VISUAL ART FORMS, PERFORMANCE ARTS AND CREATIVE WRITING.
Area of benefit
WEST YORKSHIRE AND LANCASHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window