MAYFLOWER SANCTUARY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the suffering and distress of animals who are in need in particular by provision of a rescue and re-homing service. To educate members of the public on matters concerning animal welfare.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Animals
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Derbyshire
- Doncaster
- Lincolnshire
- Nottinghamshire
- Rotherham
- Sheffield City
- Cyprus
- Romania
Governance
- 16 August 2000: Standard registration
- 18 July 2012: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 18 July 2012: Funds transferred to 1147324 MAYFLOWER SANCTUARY LIMITED
- ANIMALS IN NEED 2000 (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2007 | 30/04/2008 | 30/04/2009 | 30/04/2010 | 30/04/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £75.85k | £121.80k | £158.57k | £231.69k | £183.60k | |
|
Total expenditure | £47.09k | £126.59k | £147.48k | £172.41k | £192.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2011 | 22 February 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2011 | 18 February 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2010 | 21 February 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2010 | 21 February 2011 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 April 2009 | 28 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2009 | 29 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 31 JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 24 JULY 2000 AND 7 OCTOBER 2005
Charitable objects
(1) TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AND DISTRESS OF ANIMALS WHO ARE IN NEED OF CARE AND ATTENTION BY REASON OF SICKNESS OR BECAUSE THEY ARE STRAYS, HAVE BEEN ABANDONED, NEGLECTED OR MALTREATED, IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF A RESCUE SERVICE AND RE-HOMING SERVICE AND FOSTER HOMES FOR TEMPORARY ACCOMMODATION OF SUCH ANIMALS (2) TO EDUCATE MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC ON MATTERS CONCERNING ANIMAL WELFARE (3) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY OF PET OWNERS WHO ARE IN NEED AND IN PARTICULAR BY THE ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF NEUTERING SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window