HANSLOPE 326 CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hanslope After School Clubs provides after school and holiday care to children from primary school foundation year up to 12 years old, in a safe, stimulating environment. The latest Ofsted rating was Good. Through professional tutors, we also provide a wide range of after school activities such as Pottery, Football and Gym.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £12,350 from 1 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Milton Keynes
Governance
- 23 March 2000: Standard registration
- HANSLOPE AFTER SCHOOL CLUB (Working name)
- HANSLOPE AFTER SCHOOL CLUBS (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Georgina Tunnicliffe-King | Chair | 09 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Cotte-Wick | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Swift | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|||||
Zoe Snelling | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Hodgkinson | Trustee | 14 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Taylor | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott Pardoe | Trustee | 14 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANNE TERESA GAMBLES | Trustee | 14 March 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.24k | £73.76k | £73.76k | £74.95k | £117.56k | |
|
Total expenditure | £106.16k | £87.36k | £87.36k | £89.57k | £104.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.01k | £11.19k | £4.30k | £12.35k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 04 November 2024 | 127 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2024 | 455 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 September 2024 | 455 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 July 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 05 July 2021 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 04 July 2021 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 04 July 2020 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 04 July 2020 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25/12/1998 AS AMENDED ON 23/06/2011
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THROUGH PLAY, THE DEVELOPMENT AND LEARNING OF CHILDREN PRIMARILY OF PRIMARY-SCHOOL AGE BY: A) OFFERING APPROPRIATE PLAY OPPORTUNITIES AND CARE FACILITIES WITHIN EXTENDED HOURS GROUPS, TOGETHER WITH THE RIGHT OF PARENTS OR GUARDIANS TO TAKE RESPONSIBILITY FOR AND TO BECOME INVOLVED IN THE ACTIVITIES OF SUCH GROUPS, ENSURING THAT SUCH GROUPS OFFER OPPORTUNITIES FOR ALL CHILDREN IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE CURRENT LEGISLATION; B) PROVIDING AND ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EXTENDED HOURS ACTIVITIES AND CLUBS AT THE SCHOOL FOR THE USE OF THE 326 CLUB
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE HANSLOPE, MILTON KEYNES
Contact information
- Address:
-
39 WESTERN DRIVE
HANSLOPE
MILTON KEYNES
MK19 7LB
- Phone:
- 01908510709
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window