ALLIANCE FOR AFRICAN ASSISTANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity provide arange of activies that support our aims and objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England
- Kenya
- Uganda
- United States
Governance
- 30 May 2000: Standard registration
- 30 March 2017: Removed (Does not operate)
- AFRICAN ALLIANCE (Working name)
- ALLIANCE-UK (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.90k | £6.66k | £5.33k | £6.72k | £4.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.06k | £6.77k | £5.48k | £6.80k | £4.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 31 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 06 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 13TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY OF THOSE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL OR ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR AS A RESULT OF LOCAL, NATIONAL OR INTERNATIONAL DISASTERS INCLUDING (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) PERSONS WHO ARE IMMIGRANTS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR WHO HAVE BEEN GRANTED OR WHO HAVE APPLIED FOR REFUGEE OR POLITICAL ASYLUM STATUS IN THE UNITED KINGDOM (OR ANY LIKE STATUS WHICH MAY HEREAFTER REPLACE THEM UNDER THE LAWS APPLICABLE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM) AND TO UNDERTAKE OR TO LAY OUT FUNDS FOR ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE WHICH WILL BENEFIT SUCH PERSONS LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window