Trustees PARK LODGE PROJECT
Charity number: 1086450

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Malcolm Pell | Trustee | 12 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Maureen Denise Dover | Trustee | 04 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Oldman | Trustee | 13 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rodney Arthur Moore | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Nigel George Oldman | Trustee | 02 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Jane Lockton | Trustee | 29 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Pollard | Trustee |
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.