HOP, SKIP AND JUMP (SOUTH WEST)
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Play and support centre on the outskirts of Bristol for children with special needs and their families and carers. Trained playworkers and a large playcentre, with specialist equipment, soft play and sensory rooms and a large outdoor playground are available to enable children with any special need be stimulated and have fun in a safe controlled environment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 August 2000: Standard registration
- 24 February 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HOP SKIP AND JUMP SOUTH WEST (Working name)
- SEVEN SPRINGS (SOUTH WEST) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2015 | 31/01/2016 | 31/01/2017 | 31/01/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £127.66k | £160.81k | £5.77k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £135.36k | £171.71k | £2.29k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.12k | £90.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 29 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 January 2018 | 22 November 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 12 JUNE 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND RELIEF TO CHILDREN WITH SPECIAL NEEDS, THEIR FAMILIES AND CARERS, ESPECIALLY, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND.
Area of benefit
IN THE SOUTH WEST OF ENGLAND.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window