SAHARA (COVENTRY) LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sahara (Coventry) Ltd is a user lead community organization which provides services for Asian elders in Coventry City and the surrounding area. Some elders are vulnerable,isolated, depressed and find it difficult to cope.Sahara provides emotional support in office, during home visits and over the phone,runs Support Groups, Befriending Service and voices the needs and concerns of its users.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Coventry City
Governance
- 04 June 2001: Standard registration
- 15 May 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- SAHARA PROJECT (Working name)
- SAHARA PROJECT (COVENTRY) LTD (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.79k | £28.64k | £19.65k | £35.00k | £30.92k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.61k | £21.21k | £19.43k | £32.00k | £30.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £8.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.94k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 118 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 14 February 2022 | 14 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 23/07/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE POVERTY SICKNESS AND SUFFERING OF ASIAN ELDERS THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING ADVOCACY AND INFORMATION SERVICES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window