THE STUDENTS EXPLORING MARRIAGE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
An education charity that works in partnership with schools and other organisations enabling young people to explore how to create and sustain positive, long-lasting relationships. Explore facilitates youth-led sessions to help young people challenge negative and/or unrealistic media depictions of relationships, develop emotional literacy and knowledge of relationships to support positive choices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 21 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANGUS SOMERVILLE | Chair | 15 April 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ioana Burtea | Trustee | 09 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Cottrell | Trustee | 03 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jane Laura Reap | Trustee | 08 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
KATIE THOM | Trustee | 26 April 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.09k | £94.76k | £85.12k | £90.30k | £95.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £152.84k | £86.16k | £79.08k | £110.51k | £124.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 01 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 17 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 10 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 26 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 29 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25TH JANUARY 2000, AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7TH DECEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC, AND IN PARTICULAR YOUNG PEOPLE OF ALL RACES AND CREEDS ON ALL ASPECTS OF MARRIAGE INCLUDING BUT NOT RESTRICTED TO WEDDINGS, FAMILY LIFE, RELATIONSHIPS, BRINGING UP CHILDREN, THE BREAKDOWN OF RELATIONSHIPS AND DIVORCE AND THE INSTITUTION OF MARRIAGE IN THE CONTEXT OF SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Broad Lane House
Broad Lane
Swanmore
Hampshire
SO32 2PD
- Phone:
- 07929867472
- Email:
- angussomerville@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window