Financial history STAMFORD BRIDGE SINGERS

Charity Number: 1080294
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £7.23k £340 £340 £3.85k £8.20k
Total expenditure £9.20k £781 £781 £5.07k £6.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A