Accounts and annual returns PREMPEH COLLEGE EUROPE ALUMNI

Charity number: 1082189
Charity reporting is overdue by 753 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 22 days
Annual return 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 387 days
Annual return 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 753 days
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 753 days
Annual return 30 June 2021 06 July 2022 67 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 29 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required