GRAYSHOTT COMMUNITY CARE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Principally transport of mainly elderly clients to hospitals, medical and dental appointments.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 27 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sharon McIvor | Chair | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Bernard Vyner | Trustee | 26 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Norman | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.59k | £3.58k | £6.23k | £6.63k | £8.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £3.30k | £5.29k | £7.04k | £11.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 31 July 2024 | 177 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 10 NOVEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE RELIEF TO THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S GRAYSHOTT WHO HAVE NEED BECAUSE OF AGE, MENTAL OR PHYSICAL DISABILITY OR POVERTY, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A TRANSPORT SERVICE.
Area of benefit
THE INHABITANTS OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. LUKE'S GRAYSHOTT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 HURSTMERE CLOSE
GRAYSHOTT
HINDHEAD
GU26 6TR
- Phone:
- 01428606940
- Email:
- debbiemnorman@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window