Financial history CHRIST ABUNDANT LIFE MINISTRY INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1083880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £43.55k £10.78k £19.55k £26.63k £145.73k
Total expenditure £48.28k £11.68k £10.63k £29.99k £15.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A