Accounts and annual returns SOMEWHERE TO GO LIMITED

Charity Number: 1080963
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 May 2024 23 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2024 23 March 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2023 12 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2022 31 May 2023 61 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2022 31 May 2023 61 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2021 14 March 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2021 03 June 2022 64 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 May 2020 02 November 2021 216 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 02 November 2021 216 days late Download Open in new window