SOMEWHERE TO GO LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve poverty and distress among the most disadvantaged in the community, by providing a space where people can feel welcome and comfortable and create an environment which will enhance self worth & self esteem. To offer nourishing food, clothing; to facilitate access to medical & welfare services; help with housing and benefits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
Total income includes £199,462 from 3 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- North Somerset
Governance
- 31 May 2000: Standard registration
- 06 October 2022: Funds received from 1081265 COMFORT AND WARMTH
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Daniel Heley | Chair | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Sian Wilmot | Trustee | 18 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Scott Mr | Trustee | 11 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Louise Parker | Trustee | 08 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Aldridge | Trustee | 04 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gibbons | Trustee | 01 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mary Veronica Usher-Clark | Trustee | 04 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Speller | Trustee | 14 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £295.53k | £167.42k | £127.85k | £264.69k | £402.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £253.09k | £149.68k | £146.44k | £170.95k | £202.33k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £75.00k | £40.55k | £25.31k | £60.00k | £199.46k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | 12 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 May 2023 | 61 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 14 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | 03 June 2022 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 216 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 02 November 2021 | 216 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 03 MAY 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND DISTRESS AND TO OPERATE UPON CHRISTIAN PRINCIPALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Somewhere to GO
4a Boulevard
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS23 1NA
- Phone:
- 01934 641880
- Email:
- info@somewheretogo.net
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window