ONE NORTH EAST LONDON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity was placed into Members' Voluntary Liquidation (solvent) on 17 Feb 23 and Hugh Jesseman of Antony Batty & Company LLP was appointed as Liquidator. Please contact him with regard to any queries regarding the Charity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2021
People

4 Trustee(s)
19 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Redbridge
- Waltham Forest
Governance
- 11 May 2000: Standard registration
- WALTHAM FOREST ALCOHOL COUNSELLING SERVICES ( W A C S ) (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVE COOK | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rob William Bonneywell | Trustee | 28 March 2020 |
|
|
||||
Guy Wade | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
CLUNY MACPHERSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £244.55k | £306.76k | £276.15k | £284.96k | £292.21k | |
|
Total expenditure | £229.98k | £287.19k | £333.17k | £307.71k | £285.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 10 MAY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 19 MARCH 2002 AND 12 DECEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED 1 FEBRUARY 2009 as amended on 10 Apr 2019
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED FOR THE RELIEF OF PERSONS ADDICTED TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUGS AND PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE NORTH AND EAST AREAS OF LONDON AND TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS TO OVERCOME THE PROBLEMS ATTACHED TO ALCOHOL AND/OR DRUG ADDICTION. TO OFFER SUPPORT TO FAMILIES AND PARTNERS OF THOSE SUFFERING FROM THE PROBLEMS OF ADDICTION INCLUDING DRUGS, ALCOHOL, GAMBLING, EATING DISORDERS OR ANY OTHER ADDICTION.
Area of benefit
LONDON BOROUGH OF WALTHAM FOREST
Contact information
- Address:
-
care of Antony Batty & Company LLP
3 Field Court
Gray's inn
London
WC1R 5EF
- Phone:
- 02082200132
- Email:
- info@1ne.org.uk
- Website:
-
1ne.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window