Financial history RELATE PETERBOROUGH AND DISTRICT

Charity number: 1080571
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2011 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £173.73k £166.84k £183.42k £162.95k £161.02k
Total expenditure £173.09k £184.15k £194.15k £190.12k £177.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £0