NORTHAMPTON ASSOCIATION FOR ACCOMMODATION FOR SINGLE HOMELESS

Charity number: 1080260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity works to relieve hardship, need and distress amongst those who are homeless, and to educate the public concerning the homeless.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £13,401
Total expenditure: £1,669,628

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 April 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • NORTHAMPTON ASSOCIATION FOR ACCOMMODATION FOR SING (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Peter James Vigurs Trustee 04 October 2021
None on record
DAVID ANTHONY BILLSON Trustee 17 August 2020
THE NATIONAL HOCKEY FOUNDATION
Received: On time
RAYNSFORD'S ALMSHOUSE CHARITIES
Received: On time
PETER VERNON PHILLIPS Trustee 20 November 2017
None on record
MARTIN ALAN COX Trustee
None on record
THOMAS WILLIAM JAMES ADAMS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £932.85k £1.23m £1.43m £1.61m £2.00m
Total expenditure £907.26k £1.17m £1.36m £1.52m £1.67m
Income from government contracts £704.23k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £30.06k £37.99k £38.75k £153.59k
Income - Donations and legacies £14.52k £12.94k £5.78k £3.69k £1.10k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £917.40k £1.21m £1.42m £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £933 £55 £44 £2.82k £12.30k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £867.68k £1.17m £1.36m £1.52m £1.66m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £10.67k £1.42k £15.71k £16.04k £22.83k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £39.58k £0 £0 £0 £4.90k

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £248.73k £551.49k £561.80k £561.68k £560.20k
Long-term investments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £288.91k £290.12k £401.06k £510.01k £977.00k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £48.22k £294.34k £332.54k £352.17k £487.87k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 16 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 03 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 16 March 2023 44 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 20 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 11 February 2021 11 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Chartlands Chambers
3 St. Giles Terrace
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 2BN
Phone:
01604 620892