Financial history RURAL ARTS NORTH YORKSHIRE

Charity Number: 1081007
Charity reporting is up to date (5 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £353.07k £627.53k £526.37k £604.07k £586.33k
Total expenditure £282.70k £390.85k £394.05k £466.90k £645.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A £75.94k N/A
Income from government grants £272.89k £539.15k £343.73k £216.42k £360.80k
Income - Donations and legacies N/A £10.84k £23.79k £17.03k £5.65k
Income - Other trading activities N/A £19.49k £85.18k £111.72k £75.77k
Income - Charitable activities N/A £539.15k £343.73k £468.50k £495.80k
Income - Endowments N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment N/A £0 £0 £0 £9.12k
Income - Other N/A £58.05k £73.67k £6.82k £0
Income - Legacies N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A £378.94k £382.20k £454.41k £626.02k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A £11.91k £11.86k £12.49k £15.77k
Expenditure - Governance N/A £0 £0 £0 £3.80k
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other N/A £0 £0 £0 £3.80k