THE ZIBBY GARNETT TRAVELLING FELLOWSHIP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing grants for overseas study travel for conservation students
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 03 July 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Tear MBE | Chair | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Douglas | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Garnett MBE | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christos Karydis PhD, MA | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Wheeler LVO | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.86k | £9.15k | £14.09k | £68.96k | £9.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.22k | £6.58k | £8.96k | £19.83k | £19.44k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED MARCH 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEEDS DATED 9 MAY 2000 AND 17 MARCH 2010
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND ALL OR SUCH PART OR PARTS OF THE CAPITAL FOR OR TOWARDS THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES TO STUDENTS AT ENGLISH UNIVERSITIES AND ALSO CRAFT APPRENTICES AND YOUNG PROFESSIONALS IN THE EARLY YEARS OF CAREER DEVELOPMENT WHO WISH TO TRAVEL ABROAD FOR GENERAL EDUCATIONAL PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH PRACTICALSTUDY AND RESEARCH INTO THE FOUNDATION'S FIELD OF INTEREST (AS HEREINAFTER DEFINED) IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT PROVIDED THAT DURING THE ACCUMULATION PERIOD THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION ACCUMULATE THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF THE INCOME OF THE TRUST FUND BY INVESTING THE SAME AND THE RESULTING INCOME THEREOF IN OR UPON INVESTMENTS HEREBY AUTHORISED AND SHALL HOLD SUCH ACCUMULATIONS AS AN ACCRETION TO THE CAPITAL OF THE TRUST FUND AND AS ONE FUND THEREWITH FOR ALL PURPOSES. (2) THE FOUNDATION'S FIELDS OF INTEREST ARE: HISTORIC AND DECORATIVE CRAFTS, ARCHITECTURAL CONSERVATION, HISTORIC LANDSCAPE AND GARDENS, TRADITIONAL BUILDING SKILLS, SCULPTURE AND SUCH OTHER SIMILAR OR ASSOCIATED FIELDS OF INTEREST AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FOR TIME TO TIME DETERMINE PROVIDED THAT THE STUDY OF THESE OR SIMILAR OR ASSOCIATED FIELDS OF INTEREST WOULD BE CONSIDERED TO BE EDUCATIONAL ACCORDING TO CHARITABLE LAW.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Knutsford Avenue
WATFORD
WD24 7EQ
- Phone:
- 01923245431
- Email:
- info@zibbygarnett.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window