Trustees THE ZIBBY GARNETT TRAVELLING FELLOWSHIP
Charity number: 1081403

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Tear MBE | Chair | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Catrin Jones | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Douglas | Trustee | 21 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Susan Garnett MBE | Trustee | 21 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Christos Karydis PhD, MA | Trustee | 02 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Wheeler LVO | Trustee | 02 June 2016 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.