Financial history OXFORD PHILHARMONIC ORCHESTRA TRUST

Charity number: 1084256
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.37m £1.06m £1.96m £2.99m £2.95m
Total expenditure £1.38m £1.04m £1.98m £2.74m £2.79m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £3.00k £313.60k N/A £9.50k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.05m £687.68k £1.42m £1.68m £1.59m
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £322.24k £62.03k £536.49k £1.30m £1.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 £1.35k
Income - Other £0 £313.60k £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.38m £1.04m £1.98m £2.74m £2.79m
Expenditure - Raising funds £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Governance £7.80k £0 £0 £11.33k £16.02k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0