THE LOWE SYNDROME TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RAISE AWARENESS OF LOWE SYNDROME, HELP FAMILIES INCLUSIVENESS AND TO STIMULATE MEDICAL RESEARCH FOR BETTER TREATMENT.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 23 June 2000: Standard registration
- LOWE SYNDROME TRUST (Working name)
- LST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Micheal Fennings | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anastacia Lanzara | Trustee | 23 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Laycock | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.15k | £57.58k | £18.57k | £3.86k | £38.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £75.56k | £56.72k | £69.55k | £67.15k | £28.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 08 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 05 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 05 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 21 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 02 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17TH MARCH 2000
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE LOWE SYNDROME, TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL ITS CAUSES AND TREATMENT AND TO DISSEMINATE THE RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lowe Syndrome Trust
673 Finchley Road
LONDON
NW2 2JP
- Phone:
- 02077948858
- Email:
- info@lowetrust.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window