Accounts and annual returns THE BWS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1084565
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2008 21 November 2008 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2008 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2007 13 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2007 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2006 20 December 2006 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2006 20 December 2006 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2005 28 February 2006 28 days late
Annual return 31 March 2004 08 December 2004 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2004 08 December 2004 On Time