Financial history THE BWS DEVELOPMENT TRUST

Charity number: 1084565
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2004 31/03/2005 31/03/2006 31/03/2007 30/06/2008
Total gross income £4.91k £3.12k £11.22k £1.52k £1.52k
Total expenditure £14.65k £80.67k £693 £703 £33.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A