Financial history HVP UK

Charity number: 1082685
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 08/04/2020 08/04/2021 08/04/2022 08/04/2023 08/04/2024
Total gross income £61.50k £50.35k £34.30k £18.59k £16.16k
Total expenditure £98.52k £54.61k £34.86k £14.68k £12.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A