SCARD

Charity Number: 1081572
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relieve distress for people bereaved/injured/affected by road death or injury Provide emotional and practical support via telephone help-line,meetings and personal support system Accompany families to Crown, Magistrates or Coroners Court Send out independent information with regard to the judicial system Provide access to free initial legal help and advice Raise awareness of road danger

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024

Total income: £30,805
Total expenditure: £8,526

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 July 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
ANDREW GREENWOOD Chair
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time
Susan Canyilmaz Trustee 26 October 2023
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time
ZOE ANN HAWKSLEY Trustee 30 May 2018
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time
Anne Field Trustee 11 February 2017
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time
JOHN ANDREW SCRUBY Trustee 13 December 2012
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time
CAROLE WHITTINGHAM Trustee
CAMPAIGN AGAINST DRINKING AND DRIVING (CADD)
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/06/2020 30/06/2021 30/06/2022 30/06/2023 30/06/2024
Total gross income £7.43k £10.04k £11.30k £7.40k £30.81k
Total expenditure £14.87k £5.57k £6.77k £9.11k £8.53k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 15 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024 16 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 06 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2022 02 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2021 11 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 June 2020 14 July 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
RCM Business Centres
Sandbeds Trading Estate
Dewsbury Road
Ossett
Wakefield
WF5 9ND
Phone:
01924 562252