Trustees THE BRITISH DOUBLE REED SOCIETY
Charity number: 1080461

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
James William Turnbull | Chair | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Liam David Fleet | Trustee | 20 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Caron de Burgh | Trustee | 12 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Esther Sarah Ruth Williams | Trustee | 10 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philip Stephen Eric Haworth | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Louisa Denby | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Donal Flynn | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Paul Hubbard | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Alison Jean Wathey | Trustee | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Fuller | Trustee | 29 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
IAN CROWTHER | Trustee | 02 March 2014 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.