Financial history WATERSIDE WEYMOUTH COMMUNITY FORUM

Charity number: 1081832
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.71k £9.51k £14.05k £21.01k £9.86k
Total expenditure £20.11k £13.08k £16.40k £14.55k £59.10k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A