THE BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENT WAR MEMORIAL CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity are the maintenance and upkeep of the Regimental War Memorial and surrounding gardens in Bedford Road, Kempston.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bedford
- Central Bedfordshire
Governance
- 28 March 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Cllr Richard Hyde | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
KEMPSTON TOWN COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.57k | £4.06k | £4.57k | £4.97k | £6.18k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.51k | £1.86k | £1.82k | £1.06k | £442 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 99 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 465 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 17 NOVEMBER 1999.
Charitable objects
1) THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION OF THE BEDFORDSHIRE AND HERTFORDSHIRE REGIMENTAL WAR MEMORIAL AND GARDENS. 2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
104 BEDFORD ROAD
KEMPSTON
BEDFORD
MK42 8BG
- Phone:
- 01234851005
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window