Governing document THE ROYAL CORNWALL POLYTECHNIC SOCIETY LIMITED

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 10/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 03/10/2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/05/2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27 FEB 2017
Charitable objects
THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED TO EDUCATE AND ENCOURAGE THE PUBLIC IN ALL ASPECTS OF THE ARTS SCIENCES CRAFTS AND HISTORY WITH PARTICULAR REFERENCE TO THE COUNTY OF CORNWALL AND GENERALLY TO CARRY ON THE ACTIVITIES OF THE ROYAL CORNWALL POLYTECHNIC SOCIETY AND FALMOUTH ARTS IN SUCCESSION TO THE ROYAL CORNWALL POLYTECHNIC SOCIETY AND FALMOUTH ARTS.
Area of benefit
CORNWALL.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.