GREAT EASTON C. E. PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Fund raising for Primary School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £14,450
Total expenditure: £14,827

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GT. EASTON SCHOOL P.T.A. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Molly Stevens Trustee 04 October 2024
None on record
Helen Elizabeth Wildman Trustee 08 October 2021
None on record
CLAIRE HELEN JACKMAN Trustee 07 May 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £7.11k £4.23k £11.02k £13.68k £14.45k
Total expenditure £2.35k £19.19k £5.96k £9.70k £14.83k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 03 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 30 June 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 16 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 19 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 29 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Furrows
Broxted Road
Great Easton
Dunmow
Essex
CM6 2HN
Phone:
01371870181