Financial history FRIENDS OF WONERSH SURGERY

Charity number: 1083288
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2007 30/09/2008 30/09/2009 30/09/2010 30/09/2011
Total gross income £9.08k £7.41k £8.61k £11.62k £5.17k
Total expenditure £13.12k £12.00k £10.27k £13.11k £8.30k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A