FRIENDS OF WONERSH SURGERY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
"to relieve sickness and preserve the health of patients of Wonersh Surgery in the County of Surrey by providing or assisting in the provision of equipment, facilities and services not normally provided by the statutory authorities."
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Surrey
Governance
- 10 November 2000: Standard registration
- 22 February 2017: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | 30/09/2009 | 30/09/2010 | 30/09/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.08k | £7.41k | £8.61k | £11.62k | £5.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £13.12k | £12.00k | £10.27k | £13.11k | £8.30k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2013 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21ST JANUARY 2000 AS AMENDED 21ST JULY 2000
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PATIENTS OF WONERSH SURGERY IN THE COUNTY OF SURREY BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF EQUIPMENT, FACILITIES AND SERVICES NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED BY THE STATUTORY AUTHORITIES.
Area of benefit
WONERSH
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window