BERMONDSEY VILLAGE HALL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To manage and operate the community centre known as Bermondsey Village Hall in London Borough of Southwark for the use and benefit of the inhabitants of the said Borough with priority to the Local Community in Bermondsey without distinction of political,religious or racial differences,including use for meetings,lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure-time occupation.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Southwark
Governance
- 12 April 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE PARSONS | Trustee |
|
||||||
SHIRLEY KING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.89k | £18.72k | £16.32k | £22.81k | £19.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.01k | £18.40k | £19.34k | £21.09k | £20.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 December 2024 | 315 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 04 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8TH DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO MANAGE AND OPERATE THE COMMUNITY CENTRE KNOWN AS BERMONDSEY VILLAGE HALL IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF SOUTHWARK FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID BOROUGH WITH PRIORITY TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN BERMONDSEY WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR THE OPINIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
SOUTHWARK
Contact information
- Address:
-
BERMONDSEY VILLAGE HALL
KIRBY GROVE
LONDON
SE1 3TD
- Phone:
- 02073781078
- Email:
- bermondseyhall@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window