Financial history FRIENDS OF ISHAM SCHOOL

Charity number: 1080800
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £6.85k £4.24k £4.51k £7.36k £8.77k
Total expenditure £6.62k £13.81k £387 £1.58k £8.32k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A