TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY ( BRIXTON )

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide classes, courses and study in meditation and Buddhism for people in Brixton and the surrounding areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout London
Governance
- 05 February 2001: Standard registration
- FWBO ( BRIXTON ) (Working name)
- FRIENDS OF THE WESTERN BUDDHIST ORDER ( BRIXTON ) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Guilhem Monin | Chair | 13 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bolley | Trustee | 17 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jacqueline Clarke | Trustee | 14 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sam Farquharson | Trustee | 25 May 2018 |
|
|
||||
Alan Worrell | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.07k | £55.56k | £58.59k | £72.87k | £89.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.17k | £46.91k | £60.10k | £73.63k | £98.07k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 15 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 24 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES ADOPTED ON 16 SEPTEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 2 OCTOBER 2010. AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2018 AS AMENDED ON 09 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE ASSOCIATION IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE BUDDHIST RELIGION, IN PARTICULAR BY: 1.1 ENCOURAGING MEMBERS AND OTHERS TO LIVE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE BUDDHA; 1.2 SUPPORTING ORDAINED MEMBERS OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST COMMUNITY AND OTHER DULY ORDAINED BUDDHISTS, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE COUNCIL OF THE ASSOCIATION; 1.3 MAINTAINING CLOSE COMMUNICATION WITH AND WORKING UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF THE TRIRATNA BUDDHIST ORDER AND IN CO-OPERATION WITH OTHER GROUPS WITH THE SAME OBJECTS; AND 1.4 USING APPLICATIONS OF THE BUDDHA’S TEACHING TO PROMOTE THE HEALTH AND WELL-BEING OF ALL.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED (IN PRACTICE BRIXTON AND THE SURROUNDING AREA)
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Ostade Road
LONDON
SW2 2BA
- Phone:
- 07709110681
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window