THE BRITISH SOCIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The British Sociological Association's charitable primary objective is to promote sociology. It is the professional association representing sociologists in the UK. Founded in 1951, the BSA provides a network of communication to all who are concerned with the promotion and use of sociology and sociological research.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£1,263,733
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £680.41k | |
Other trading activities | £546.04k | |
Investments | £14.37k | |
Other | £22.91k |
Total expenditure:
£1,179,749
Raising funds | £6.67k | |
Charitable activities | £1.03m | |
Other | £143.85k |
-£62,397 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £150.52k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.03m | |
Retained for future use | £83.98k |
People

11 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
500 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 07 April 2000: Standard registration
- 28 January 2013: Funds received from 1072522 ASSOCIATION FOR THE TEACHING OF THE SOCIAL SCIENCE...
- BSA (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Paul Ian Campbell | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor Vanessa Linda Katarina May | Trustee | 07 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Maryam Sholevar | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jennifer Remnant | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Michael John Sheaff | Trustee | 09 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN BLUNDELL | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Finn Mackay | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Stephen Raven | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Professor Nicola Ingram | Trustee | 10 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Elizabeth Cotton | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Rima Saini | Trustee | 08 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jason Arday | Trustee | 09 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Mark Doidge | Trustee | 13 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Professor Christopher Yuill | Trustee | 26 May 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.29m | £974.50k | £945.71k | £1.06m | £1.26m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.22m | £845.19k | £756.59k | £889.99k | £1.18m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.77k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £47.77k | £230 | £25 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £753.35k | £697.56k | £597.33k | £656.07k | £546.04k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £511.49k | £220.02k | £316.61k | £386.89k | £680.41k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.44k | £2.27k | £48 | £5.49k | £14.37k | |
|
Income - Other | £25.07k | £6.89k | £31.49k | £6.82k | £22.91k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.03m | £685.52k | £593.26k | £734.88k | £1.03m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £3.62k | £159.67k | £6.06k | £6.52k | £6.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.76k | £9.89k | £10.39k | £9.89k | £17.36k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £3.62k | £5.12k | £6.06k | £6.52k | £6.67k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £184.27k | £0 | £157.28k | £148.59k | £143.85k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £915.65k | £676.53k | £633.76k | £605.95k | £601.90k | |
|
Long-term investments | £699.19k | £1.07m | £1.43m | £1.44m | £1.45m | |
|
Other assets | £1.02m | £966.70k | £840.99k | £983.66k | £1.07m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£26.83k | -£22.38k | -£5.80k | -£3.08k | -£1.70k | |
|
Total liabilities | £468.49k | £235.63k | £208.53k | £158.44k | £158.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 20 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 25 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2023 | 64 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 03 January 2023 | 64 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 DECEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTIONS DATED 5 APRIL 2001, 6 DECEMBER 2002, 20 JUNE 2003 AND 31 JULY 2007
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION BY THE PROMOTION AND DIFFUSION OF THE KNOWLEDGE OF SOCIOLOGY BY LECTURES, PUBLICATIONS, THE PROMOTION AND PUBLICATION OF RESEARCH AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF CONTACT BETWEEN WORKERS IN ALL RELEVANT FIELDS OF ENQUIRY, AND BY UNDERTAKING SUCH OTHER ACTIVITIES AS SHALL BE CONDUCIVE TO THE ATTAINMENT OF THESE OBJECTS PROVIDED THAT THE SAME SHALL BE LEGALLY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The British Sociological Associatio
Chancery Court
Belmont Business Park
DURHAM
DH1 1TW
- Phone:
- 01913830839
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window