Financial history FRIENDS OF ST STEPHENS INFANT SCHOOL

Charity number: 1083472
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £4.82k £9.12k £15.28k £2.73k £8.26k
Total expenditure £3.18k £12.68k £18.60k £1.61k £7.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A