ONWARD CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The proclamation and furtherance of the Gospel of God and his son Jesus Christ and the preaching and teaching of the word of God in accordance with the essential doctrines and articles of belief of Elim Churches in Great Britain - as approved by the general council from time to time.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Cheshire West & Chester
Governance
- 05 December 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINA KOSTECKYJ | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Geoffrey John Leckey | Trustee | 22 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HOLLAND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.45k | £26.07k | £36.72k | £36.20k | £41.80k | |
|
Total expenditure | £30.40k | £27.55k | £33.32k | £34.65k | £34.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 01 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 07 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 04 February 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 26 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 SEPTEMBER 2000
Charitable objects
(I) THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND THE PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE CHURCH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE ESSENTIAL DOCTRINES AND ARTICLES OF BELIEF OF ELIM CHURCHES IN GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME (II)THE FURTHERANCE OF CHARITABLE RELIGIOUS WORK OF THE CHURCH CONSISTENTLY WITH THE DOCTRINES AND ARTICLES (III) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE OBJECTS OF THE CHURCH OR ANY OF THEM
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 NELSON STREET
HYDE
SK14 1PE
- Phone:
- 01619152631
- Email:
- c.kosteckyj@sky.com
- Website:
-
onwardcentre.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window