BEN'S CENTRE FOR VULNERABLE PEOPLE (SHEFFIELD)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Statement A lifeline and place of sanctuary for the sufferers of addiction and street culture. Our mission To provide a safe space and an open hand to those who suffer through substance misuse and its barriers. Our vision To give hope and opportunity to those who have neither. Our core values Inclusion, opportunity, and motivation to live unhindered by trauma and substance dependency.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £52,284 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 19 July 2001: Standard registration
- 12 January 2023: Funds received from 1142166 CHURCHES TOGETHER IN BROOMHILL AND BROOMHALL
- BEN'S PLACE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian Wilson | Trustee | 02 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Sarah Batty | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jade Hearsum | Trustee | 10 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Alan Brailey | Trustee | 01 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Williams | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
IAN SHERMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £176.36k | £353.48k | £338.07k | £385.83k | £432.64k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.69k | £229.98k | £293.05k | £382.66k | £424.65k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £53.15k | £57.28k | £61.88k | £52.28k | £52.28k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24 NOVEMBER 1999 AS AMENDED BY A SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 14 DECEMBER 2000 as amended on 11 Apr 2022 as amended on 06 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
To relieve poverty, sickness and distress of persons suffering from addiction and street culture in the Sheffield area in particular by the provision of a day centre offering advice, food, clothing and washing facilities
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Wilkinson Street
Sheffield
S10 2GB
- Phone:
- 07771897086
- Email:
- benscentre@hotmail.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window