THE CHILDREN OF LOTA CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE DISTRICT OF LOTA IN CHILE, SOUTH AMERICA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Kensington And Chelsea
- Chile
Governance
- 30 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR R C P MAYHEW | Chair |
|
||||||
LOUISA CLARE MAYHEW DE JACKSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS L B MAYHEW | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.80k | £18.50k | £17.43k | £25.81k | £29.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.90k | £16.78k | £19.44k | £22.23k | £27.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 05 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 28 February 2024 | 23 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 06 April 2023 | 60 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 05 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 28TH FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF WELFARE AND EDUCATION OF CHILDREN IN THE DISTRICT OF LOTA IN CHILE, SOUTH AMERICA.
Area of benefit
LOTA IN CHILE, SOUTH AMERICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
40 HYDE PARK GATE
LONDON
SW7 5DT
- Phone:
- 02072250394
- Email:
- ianeiloart@sky.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window