ST BEDE HOME AND SCHOOL ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The St Bede Home and School Association provides support to St Bede C of E Primary school in Winchester. It's object is to advance the education and wellbeing of pupils of the school.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 15 May 2000: Standard registration
- ST BEDE SCHOOL H S A (Working name)
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Dolman | Chair | 12 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Giles Edward James Hammond | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emily Briars | Trustee | 23 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amy Wilmott | Trustee | 29 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Charlotte Harvey | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gemma Andem | Trustee | 12 November 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.68k | £13.16k | £15.49k | £16.23k | £16.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.13k | £23.19k | £13.64k | £14.63k | £28.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 08 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 21 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 11 June 2023 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 18 November 2021 | 171 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1999.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL.
Area of benefit
ST BEDE C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St. Bede C of E Primary School
Gordon Road
Winchester
SO23 7DD
- Phone:
- 01962852463
- Email:
- hsastbede@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window