Financial history TOTNES IMAGE BANK TRUST

Charity number: 1082531
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 01/01/2020 01/01/2021 01/01/2022 01/01/2023 01/01/2024
Total gross income £2.61k £11.88k £6.67k £2.87k £3.09k
Total expenditure £4.74k £2.61k £4.91k £8.41k £4.82k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A