THE WASWAHILI COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity number: 1083065
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The advancement of education of children and young people(THE AREA OF BENEFIT UNITED KINGDOM AND KENYA) in the Waswahili culture, and by the promotion of facilities for leisure time occupation, and recreation. Relief of suffering amongst person who have been bereaved

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £849
Total expenditure: £431

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Overseas Aid/famine Relief
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Barking And Dagenham
  • Newham
  • Kenya

Governance

Registration history:
  • 27 October 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • W.C.T. (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Abdulkadir Omar Chair 08 March 2020
None on record
Omar Fakii Trustee 08 March 2020
None on record
Salim Mohamed Trustee 08 March 2020
None on record
Mohsin Garwan Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
Khalid Nasser Nabhan Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
Ahmed Garwani Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record
Hadi Said Khamis Trustee 09 September 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £0 £345 £174 £849 £849
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £431 £431
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 12 February 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 04 October 2024 247 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 11 April 2023 70 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 11 April 2023 435 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 01 June 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
11 Peloton Avenue
LONDON
E20 1HB
Phone:
07903626768
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available