TURKISH CYPRIOT COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1080926
Charity reporting is up to date (59 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

TCCA PROVIDES SERVICES TO THE TURKISH SPEAKING COMMUNITY WITH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION AND ADVICE, SOCIAL CARE, COUNSELLING, SOCIAL AND CULTURAL ACTIVITIES THROUGH THE NEEDS LED PROJECTS. . OUR BIGGEST PROJECT IS HOMECARE WHICH ENABLES THE ELDERLY AND DISABLED OF OUR COMMUNITY TO LIVE IN THEIR HOME INDEPENDENTLY.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 May 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • TCCA (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Niyazi Enver Chair 01 May 2017
None on record
Munevver Borova Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Gulfidan Dervish Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Yusuf Ahmet Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Erdogan Baca Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Bayram Ibrahim Cubuk Trustee 25 February 2021
None on record
Hussain Mustafa Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Gokay Ucar Trustee 22 November 2018
CYPRIOT COMMUNITY CENTRE OF THE ASSOCIATION OF CYPRIOT ORGANISATIONS
Received: On time
Nurcan Kamil Trustee 22 November 2018
None on record
Suleyman Fuat Trustee 25 February 2016
None on record
TURKAY HADJI-FILIPPOU Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.22m £1.37m £1.55m £1.34m £1.44m
Total expenditure £1.24m £1.28m £1.52m £1.38m £1.46m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A £26.94k
Income - Donations and legacies £80.99k £249.73k £356.55k £48.15k £0
Income - Other trading activities £484 £1.11m £0 £0 £1.35m
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £1.21m £0
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £47.36k £13.93k £53.53k £79.46k £0
Income - Other £1.10m £0 £1.14m £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.23k £35.85k £165.07k £1.11m £1.46m
Expenditure - Raising funds £13.44k £238.14k £260.27k £203.06k £0
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £1.23m £1.00m £1.10m £68.02k £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £0 £113.18k £104.52k £105.36k £95.86k
Long-term investments £133.20k £0 £0 £0 £0
Other assets £666.56k £870.57k £943.13k £823.27k £827.63k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £124.92k £215.19k £249.09k £170.58k £183.68k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 31 March 2025 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 31 March 2025 59 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TURKISH CYPRIOT COMMUNITY
ASSOCIATION
628-630 GREEN LANES
LONDON
.
N8 0SD
Phone:
07958696734
Email:
info@tcca.org